Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget And Management, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103
Title
Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 /CH0214
Title
Department of Budget and Management - Budget Analysts - Qualifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0384
Title
Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax Refunds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822 /CH0239
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - City of Hyattsville and Satellite Organizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1488
Title
State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0104 /CH0214 Department of Budget and Management - Budget Analysts - Qualifications By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Appropriations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 /CH0384 Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax Refunds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0822 /CH0239 State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - City of Hyattsville and Satellite Organizations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1488 State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM