Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Arora, Bobo, Bromwell, Cane, Clagett, Clippinger, DeBoy, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hough, Jameson, K. Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, Mitchell, Norman, Oaks, Olszewski, B. Robinson, Schuh, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Stukes, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Wilson, Wood, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a course in financial literacy; requiring each county board of education to implement the financial literacy curriculum content developed by the State Board in every high school in the county; and requiring students to complete a course in financial literacy in order to graduate from high school.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0191 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM