Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination of a provision of law authorizing the employees of a vendor or authorized representative of a vendor of portable electronics insurance to be compensated in a specified manner; and repealing a requirement that the Maryland Insurance Administration keep track of specified complaints, make a specified determination, and, on or before January 1, 2017, make a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0750
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Finance 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM