Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0959


CH0620

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to enforce certain provisions of law under certain applicable powers; requiring the Commissioner to adopt certain regulations under certain circumstances that are consistent with certain federal regulations, rules, and guidance; prohibiting certain carriers from excluding or limiting certain benefits or denying certain coverage because a certain health condition was present on a certain date; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0872
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {556485/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-28)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {556485/1 Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (110-28) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Finance 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49B
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   15-137.1,   15-1A-01 through 15-1A-22 )
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:33 PM