Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police - Workers' Compensation - Lyme Disease Presumption - Repeal of Termination Date PG/MC 110-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to an occupational disease presumption under workers' compensation law for Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission park police officers who contract Lyme disease under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-7)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (125-7) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM