Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide comprehensive technical assistance to any business that qualifies for certain financial assistance; requiring the Program to include certain types of technical assistance; requiring the Corporation to include a detailed description of the implementation of the program in its annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly; and requiring the Corporation to adopt regulations to carry out the Program.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375163/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-7)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development – Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program – Establishment
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {375163/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program – Establishment
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-7) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Referred Rules 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 1:25 PM
Click to return on the top page