Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 13-20
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the compensation of the members of the Montgomery County Board of Education; authorizing a student member to elect to receive certain compensation at a certain time; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 13-20
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 13-20
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-2)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 13-20
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 13-20
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-2) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 52
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-902 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:15 PM