Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to conduct specified analyses based on the available data of specified foreclosure trends for residential real property in Prince George's County; requiring the Department and the Commissioner to report the Department's and the Commissioner's findings to specified committees and specified delegations of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1035 Session: 2008 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690514/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments {690514/2 Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM