Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 784
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum benefit from 60% to 65% that a member of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may receive for the normal service retirement allowance.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-14)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 784
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (122-14) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Adopted 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 784
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM