Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Jones
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to provide a certain list of digital tools to the State Department of Education by a certain date each year; requiring the Department to publish an online database of digital tools provided by county boards by September 1 each year; requiring the State Department of Education to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by July 1, 2022, on best practices in areas of data management, engagement by county boards, and recommended statutory changes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0733
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {325167/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-91)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-24)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {325167/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-91) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (113-24) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 9:05 AM
Click to return on the top page