Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 3/1/2021 2:56:51 AM
Monday, March 1, 2021
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Canceled
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Aid to Education
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance

Created: 1/13/2021 5:14 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting

Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting

House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Canceled
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Aid to Education
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance

Created: 1/13/2021 5:14 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 2/27/2021 10:43 AM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Voting Session
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Voting session will take place at 5pm or following budget hearings.

Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting

Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 2/26/2021 2:52 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Korman

Public Utilities – Office of Climate Counsel – Establishment (Climate Counsel Act)
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Climate Crisis and Education Act
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
Del Valderrama

Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Del Smith

Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment
Del Bhandari

Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Del Lierman, et al

Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Del Charkoudian

Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Del Lierman

Plastic Bag Reduction Act
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Del Wilson

Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Del Wilson

Electric Cooperatives – Meetings – Alterations
Del Qi

Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Del Qi

Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Del Brooks

Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations
Del Metzgar

Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Del Dumais

Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts – Miscellaneous
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
Del Qi

State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Lists of Business Entities Not Filing Annual Report
Del Conaway

Business Regulation – Pawnbrokers and Pawn Transactions – Conversion of Interest Into Fees
Del Conaway

Business Regulation - Pawnbrokers and Pawn Transactions - Limitation on Conversion of Interest to Fees
Del Conaway

Business Regulation – Pawnbrokers and Pawn Transactions – Interest and Fees

Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee - (Economic Matters Committee)
Created: 2/25/2021 11:40 AM
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 2/26/2021 2:54 PM
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Work Session
3:30 PM to 4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 2/26/2021 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Hill, et al

Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Hill

Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Del Sample-Hughes

General Provisions - State Song - Repeal
Del Valentino-Smith

State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
Del Cullison

State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Del Charles

State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Certification – Revisions

Created: 2/5/2021 4:04 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Henson

Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Dels Stein and Bartlett

Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
Del Lopez

Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Del Attar

Crimes - Firearms - Straw Purchase Participant Penalty
Del Amprey

Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)

Public Safety Subcommittee - (Judiciary Committee)
Canceled
Public Safety Subcommittee - Work Session
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 670

Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - (Judiciary Committee)
Created: 2/24/2021 9:38 AM
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HBs: 88, 128, 231, 234, 270
(Added - 2/27/2021 9:13 AM)
Agenda to come.
(Removed - 2/27/2021 9:13 AM)

Created: 2/25/2021 4:16 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del K. Young

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Del Rosenberg

Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Del Buckel

Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Certified Historic Structure and Single-Family, Owner-Occupied Residence - Definitions
Del Crosby

Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Accessibility by Public Transportation
Del D. Jones

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Del Shoemaker

State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
Chr W&M (Dept)

Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Del McKay

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members – Active Status Points
Del Wilkins

Election Law - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
Del Kerr

Property Tax Credit – Business Entities – State of Emergency

Racing and Gaming Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 2/26/2021 12:56 PM
Racing and Gaming Subcommittee - Work Session
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
This work session is regrding HB 940.

Sports Wagering Workgroup - (Ways and Means Committee)
Canceled
Sports Wagering Workgroup
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Workgroup regarding HB940

Other
Baltimore City
Created: 2/25/2021 11:39 AM
5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Local Bill Hearings and Voting Session

Frederick
Created: 2/26/2021 6:30 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Frederick County Delegation Meeting

Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Created: 12/7/2020 2:25 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Meeting Video
Teleconference Dial-In #: +1 (812)-777-8417
Pin: 488 123 483#
The Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board will meet virtually to discuss issues pertaining to the Maryland life sciences community.

Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board
Created: 2/26/2021 5:52 PM
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Phone Dial in: 1-414-882-6578
PIN: 382 219 940#
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board Meeting

Montgomery
Canceled
7:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 2/22/2021 8:05 AM
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Created: 2/24/2021 11:05 AM
4:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page