Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual as a result of the person operating a vehicle in a careless or distracted manner or in violation of certain provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing that a person convicted of a violation of the Act is subject to a fine of up to $2,000 and must appear in court and may not prepay the fine; establishing additional penalties of participation in a motor vehicle safety course and up to 150 hours of community service; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0868
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640815/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {640815/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-145, 21-901.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM