Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the distribution of specified survivor benefits to surviving children of specified members of the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring a disabled child to receive specified survivor benefits; allowing a death benefit to be paid if special death benefits are waived; altering the distribution of special death benefits to surviving children of members of the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring a surviving disabled child to receive specified special death benefits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0913
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {139836/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {139836/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-403, 2-507, 26-402, 27-403, 29-201, 29-202, 29-203, 29-204, 29-204.1, 29-204.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM