Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pensions, Joint Committee On

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 /CH0270 (SB0256/CH0269)
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202 /CH0268 (SB0255/CH0267)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 /CH0527 (SB0353/CH0528)
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0272 (SB0401/CH0271)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership Elections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817 /CH0274 (SB0399/CH0273)
Title
Employees' Pension System - Purchase of Credit for Eligibility Service - Legislative Employees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0083 (SB0448/CH0082)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 /CH0278 (SB0913/CH0277)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0269 (HB0201/CH0270)
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353 /CH0528 (HB0304/CH0527)
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 /CH0273 (HB0817/CH0274)
Title
Employees' Pension System - Purchase of Credit for Eligibility Service - Legislative Employees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0271 (HB0815/CH0272)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership Elections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0082 (HB0823/CH0083)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 /CH0277 (HB1122/CH0278)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0201 /CH0270 (SB0256/CH0269) Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 AM
HB0202 /CH0268 (SB0255/CH0267) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 AM
HB0304 /CH0527 (SB0353/CH0528) Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0815 /CH0272 (SB0401/CH0271) State Retirement and Pension System - Membership Elections By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0817 /CH0274 (SB0399/CH0273) Employees' Pension System - Purchase of Credit for Eligibility Service - Legislative Employees By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0823 /CH0083 (SB0448/CH0082) State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB1122 /CH0278 (SB0913/CH0277) State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 /CH0269 (HB0201/CH0270) Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0353 /CH0528 (HB0304/CH0527) Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0399 /CH0273 (HB0817/CH0274) Employees' Pension System - Purchase of Credit for Eligibility Service - Legislative Employees By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0401 /CH0271 (HB0815/CH0272) State Retirement and Pension System - Membership Elections By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0448 /CH0082 (HB0823/CH0083) State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 /CH0277 (HB1122/CH0278) State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM