Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students – Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Bhandari, Acevero, Arikan, Bagnall, Boteler, Brooks, Cain, Cardin, Conaway, W. Fisher, Grammer, Guyton, Hettleman, Hornberger, Ivey, Jalisi, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Moon, Sample-Hughes, Solomon, Sydnor, Terrasa, Wilkins, P. Young, and Ebersole
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to study and make recommendations regarding any statutory or regulatory changes needed to the Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students; and requiring, by December 31, 2019, the Department to submit its recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education and the General Assembly.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {845668/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students – Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {845668/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students – Report
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM