Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Payroll Recovery Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Haynes, Anderson, Anderton, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Branch, Buckel, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Glenn, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sophocleus, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 783
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Central Payroll Bureau of the Office of the State Comptroller to establish regular pay periods and pay each employee at least once every 2 weeks or twice a month; requiring each appointing authority to calculate and report specified payroll information to the Central Payroll Bureau; requiring an employee or their exclusive representative to initiate a specified grievance procedure under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1031
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Payroll Recovery Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584568/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {963223/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (50-86)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {313623/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-85)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {133725/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-86)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {793129/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (49-87)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Payroll Recovery Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-48)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787777/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {373620/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {973429/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {103820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {853327/2 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {453326/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {203721/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {163726/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {703420/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-29)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-11)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-48)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Payroll Recovery Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 783
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Payroll Recovery Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Payroll Recovery Act
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {584568/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {963223/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (50-86) 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {313623/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-85) 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {133725/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-86) 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {793129/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (49-87) 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Payroll Recovery Act
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {787777/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Brochin) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {373620/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-30) 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {973429/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-31) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {103820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {853327/2 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {453326/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {203721/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-31) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {163726/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-31) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {703420/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-29) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-11) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-48) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Payroll Recovery Act
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 783
Text - Chapter - Payroll Recovery Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-402, 2-402, 2-406, 2-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM