Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Wivell, Aumann, Beidle, Chang, Ciliberti, Grammer, Malone, McComas, McKay, W. Miller, Morgan, Rose, Sophocleus, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, the performance of or the attempt to perform a dismemberment abortion that kills an unborn child on a pregnant woman; authorizing a specified individual to seek a hearing before the State Board of Physicians on a specified issue; providing that specified findings of the Board from a specified hearing are admissible on that issue at a specified trial; providing for the delay of a specified trial for a specified purpose for a specified number of days; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0841
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Reassigned to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Reassigned to Health and Government Operations 23
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-217 through 20-223 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM