Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Brooks, Fennell, Frick, Glenn, Jameson, W. Miller, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on ways Western Maryland counties, Southern Maryland counties, Eastern Shore counties, and Frederick, Carroll, and Harford counties can work together to obtain federal assistance to improve communications services and accessibility in the specified counties; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 30, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0717
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143599/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force on Internet, Wireless, and Cellular Service on the Eastern Shore
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable with Amendments {143599/1 Adopted 59
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules 56
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Text - Chapter - Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM