Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home
Sponsored by
Delegate Knotts
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a contract for the initial sale of a new home to include a specified provision under specified circumstances; authorizing a seller or purchaser to declare a specified contract void and of no effect under specified circumstances; requiring a seller to return to a purchaser any deposit paid under a specified contract under specified circumstances; and requiring a deposit held by a licensed real estate broker to be distributed in accordance with specified provisions of law.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0649
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {580418/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/09/2015 4/09/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {580418/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
(   14-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page