Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for waiver of an examination for a real estate appraiser license or a certificate to provide certified real estate appraisal services for specified applicants who are licensed or certified in another state; and repealing the requirement that the State Commission on Real Estate Appraisers and Home Inspectors may only grant a waiver of specified examination requirements for an applicant for a license or certificate if the licensing or certifying state has the same examination waiver requirement.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/04/2015 3/05/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM