Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett, Atterbeary, W. Fisher, Lopez, Shetty, Bagnall, Barron, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a physician, qualified health care provider, and hospital from including a narrative describing the alleged offense or a photograph of the victim in any request to obtain payment for certain services related to sexual assault forensic examinations for certain sexually related crimes under certain circumstances; altering the services for which the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board is required to pay certain claims and for which a physician and a qualified health care provider are immune from civil liability; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0933
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {786989/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {786989/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM