Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings – Lead Testing and Reporting Requirements and Grant Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Lafferty, Boyce, Bridges, Brooks, Cain, Carr, Conaway, D.M. Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guyton, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Ivey, Jalisi, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Queen, Shetty, Stein, Stewart, Wells, Attar, and Barve
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Stating the findings and intent of the General Assembly that any exposure to lead in drinking water is dangerous to children, that schools should be proactive in reducing lead in drinking water outlets to 5 parts per billion, and that State and federal funds should be made available to schools for that purpose; specifying that the Interagency Commission on School Construction is required to give priority in awarding grants from the Healthy School Facility Fund to schools where lead is found to be present in drinking water; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0481
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {860416/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings - Elevated Level of Lead and Grant Program
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {860416/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings – Elevated Level of Lead and Grant Programs
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments {454436/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Young) Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings – Lead Testing and Reporting Requirements and Grant Programs
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Text - Chapter - Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings – Lead Testing and Reporting Requirements and Grant Programs
(   5-322 )
(   6-1501, 6-1501.1, 6-1502, 6-1503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page