Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch, Brooks, Barkley, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Clippinger, Fennell, S. Howard, Lisanti, W. Miller, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law authorizing a holder of a Class 5 brewery license to serve specified samples of beer at no charge to individuals who have attained the legal drinking age and are on a tour of the brewery or are attending a specified event at the brewery; authorizing a license holder to brew and bottle beer at a location other than the Class 5 brewery under specified circumstances; authorizing a specified type of Class 5 brewery to sell beer for on-premises consumption under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343391/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {793522/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Young) Rejected (5-33)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted (45-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-15)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {343391/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 47
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {793522/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {564132/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Young) Rejected (5-33) 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted (45-1) 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (119-15) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM