Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – 40th District Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class C beer, wine, and liquor license in certain areas of the 40th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain license holders in certain areas of the 40th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City from selling alcoholic beverages before 10 a.m. or after 10 p.m., with certain exceptions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0755
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City – 40th District Alcoholic Beverages
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City – 40th District Alcoholic Beverages
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City – 40th District Alcoholic Beverages
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City – 40th District Alcoholic Beverages
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City – 40th District Alcoholic Beverages
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {554233/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City – 40th District Alcoholic Beverages
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 7:15 PM
Click to return on the top page