Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Home Improvement Contractors - Home Improvement Contracts
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain home improvement contractors to obtain the full contract price of a home improvement contract by posting an irrevocable letter of credit in an amount equal to $100,000 per home improvement contract but not exceeding $2,000,000; authorizing certain owners to file a complaint with the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General under certain circumstances; requiring the Division to notify the contractor, investigate a certain complaint, and make certain determinations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1016
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Home Improvement Contractors - Home Improvement Contracts
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-501.1, 8-617 )
(   13-201, 13-204 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:28 PM