Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones and Griffith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Amending specified prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that specified grantees provide specified matching funds; extending the deadline for specified grantees to present evidence that a matching fund will be presented; providing that specified grants may not terminate before specified dates; changing the locations of specified capital projects; altering the purpose of specified grants; changing the names of specified grantees; making technical corrections; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0934
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604660/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {419530/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Delegates Jones, Conway, and Griffith
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, and Peters
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-7)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {604660/2 Report Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 55A
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {419530/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Delegates Jones, Conway, and Griffith 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, and Peters 61A
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-7) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2003, 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM