Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Town of Mount Airy, Carroll County and Frederick County, to undertake and carry out certain urban renewal projects for slum clearance and redevelopment; prohibiting certain land or property from being taken for certain purposes without just compensation first being paid to the party entitled to the compensation; declaring that certain land or property taken in connection with certain urban renewal powers is needed for public uses or purposes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   A1-101 through A1-114 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:32 AM