Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/3/2021 12:41:33 PM
Wednesday, March 3, 2021
Wednesday, March 3, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: March 3, 2021 11:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 3, 2021 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0066
Sen Elfreth, et al

Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
SB0415
Sen Pinsky

Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
SB0509
Sen Peters

National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
SB0563
Sen Griffith

Local Health Departments - Funding
SB0622
Sen Edwards

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
SB0656
Sen Salling

Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
SB0720
Sen Zucker

Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Pay Plan
SB0769
Sens Hester and Bailey

Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
SB0772
Sen Hester

Small Business COVID–19 Relief Act of 2021
SB0777
Sen Elfreth, et al

Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
SB0778
Sen Elfreth

Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations
SB0843
Sen Benson

I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)

Change made: March 3, 2021 11:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 3, 2021 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 3, 2021 9:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0943
Sen Guzzone

University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 - Appropriations and Degree and Credential Programs - Alterations
ADDED: 9:35 AM

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: March 3, 2021 10:06 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2021 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0944
Sen Simonaire

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees
ADDED: 10:06 AM

Change made: March 3, 2021 12:15 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
March 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0927
Sen Pinsky

Institutions of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Incentive Payments - Foreign Student Exemption
ADDED: 12:15 PM

Pensions Subcommittee
Change made: March 3, 2021 12:00 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Pensions Subcommittee - Other
March 4, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: Virtual Meeting)

House
Education Subcommittee
Change made: March 3, 2021 8:17 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 3, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0034
Del Rosenberg

State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
ADDED: 8:17 AM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: March 3, 2021 9:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 16, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0977
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Public Safety and Behavioral Health Surcharges - Behavioral Health Programs PG 414-21
HB1293
Del Amprey

Baltimore City - West North Avenue Development Authority

Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee
Change made: March 3, 2021 12:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee - Work Session
March 4, 2021 12:15 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 3, 2021 10:00 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0263
Del Wilson

Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations

Other
Baltimore City
Change made: March 3, 2021 8:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Other
March 8, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom Meeting
Subcommittee discussion on HB1027: Baltimore City-Control of Police Department of Baltimore City.

Baltimore County
Change made: March 3, 2021 8:06 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Other
March 5, 2021 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearing: HB895, HB913, HB1094, HB1197
Voting Session

Click to return on the top page