Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care Centers – Teacher Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the regulations adopted by the State Board of Education to govern the licensing and operation of child care centers to include provisions that establish certain qualifications for probationary employment for a certain indiviual to be a child care teacher in a certain child care center; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1018
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {395268/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Care Centers – Teacher Qualifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-8)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Child Care Centers - Employee Qualifications - Requirements and Application Review
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {395268/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Child Care Centers – Teacher Qualifications
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-8) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-404 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:32 PM