Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Participating Governmental Units - Amortization Schedule
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the accrued liability contributions required to be paid by a participating governmental unit on account of members of the Employees' Retirement System and Employees' Pension System who are employees of a participating governmental unit; and clarifying the application of a specified amortization period to specified legislative changes.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0821
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM