Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, McIntosh, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, B. Barnes, Barve, Beitzel, Brooks, Carr, Ciliberti, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Corderman, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gibson, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, S. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kipke, Kittleman, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McCray, McKay, Moon, Proctor, Queen, Rey, Reznik, Saab, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, West, K. Young, P. Young, and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that participation by certain organizations in the State employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program may not impede, undermine, or conflict with certain obligations or statuses; authorizing an employee of a county board to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; establishing the Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884463/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447279/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Employees of Qualifying Organizations
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884463/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Employees of County Boards
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48B
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Reassigned to Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {447279/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text - Chapter - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-501, 2-502, 2-503, 2-512, 2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM