Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Arentz, Clark, S. Howard, Impallaria, Knotts, Kramer, Morgan, and Rey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the prohibition against operating or riding on a motorcycle without specified protective headgear does not apply to an individual at least 21 years old who has been licensed to operate a motorcycle for at least 2 years, has completed a specified motorcycle safety course, or is a passenger on a motorcycle operated by a driver who has been licensed for at least 2 years or completed a specified motorcycle safety course; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0559 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM