Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery Areas
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission, in consultation with the Aquaculture Coordinating Council, to establish a workgroup of commercial oyster harvesters and other interested stakeholders in the State; requiring the workgroup to review commercial oyster harvest activity and oyster aquaculture production since the establishment of the public shellfish fishery areas; requiring the Commission to report the findings and recommendations of the workgroup to the Department of Natural Resources and certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Location
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Location
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {640513/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery Areas
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM