Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the representatives of full-time deputy sheriffs at the rank of captain and below and full-time correctional officers at the rank of captain and below in the Office of the Sheriff of Harford County to bargain collectively with the Harford County Sheriff and the Harford County Executive on specified issues; authorizing deputy sheriffs and correctional officers to take specified actions with regard to collective bargaining; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {527879/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {237471/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {734266/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {527879/1 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Substitute Committee Amendment {237471/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-0) 63A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM