Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Angel, Bromwell, Krebs, Morgan, Morhaim, and Platt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that the requirement that a State or State aided or controlled entity include in specified maintenance contracts from Blind Industries and Services of Maryland applies to products made, manufactured, remanufactured, or assembled by Blind Industries and Services of Maryland.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1144
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): May 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {526180/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {526180/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {574335/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text - Chapter - Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM