Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/25/2021 9:58:00 PM
Monday, January 25, 2021
Senate
Created: 1/4/2021 11:23 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Fiscal Briefing

House
Created: 1/4/2021 5:35 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

Canceled
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Sample-Hughes

Maryland Department of Health – Public Health Outreach Programs – Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer’s Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Del Krebs

Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Del Hill, et al

Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Del Ebersole

Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Del Barron, et al

Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health

Created: 1/21/2021 3:17 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Sample-Hughes

Maryland Department of Health – Public Health Outreach Programs – Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer’s Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Del Krebs

Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Del Hill, et al

Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Del Ebersole

Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Del Barron, et al

Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health

Other
Montgomery
Created: 1/20/2021 7:57 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee

Created: 1/15/2021 3:20 PM
7:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Metro Washington Area Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of Legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 1/15/2021 10:58 AM
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Created: 1/21/2021 4:51 PM
4:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube