Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Anderson, Aumann, Barve, Bohanan, Boteler, Cardin, Carter, Clagett, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, DeBoy, Donoghue, Elliott, Haddaway-Riccio, Harper, Haynes, Hogan, Hucker, Jacobs, Jameson, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Lafferty, McDermott, McMillan, A. Miller, Minnick, Mitchell, Oaks, Otto, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Rudolph, Schulz, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Stukes, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vitale, M. Washington, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an income tax checkoff system for voluntary contributions to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; requiring the Comptroller to include a checkoff on the individual income tax return; requiring the Comptroller to collect and account for contributions made through the checkoff system and to credit the proceeds to the Fund after deducting the amount necessary to administer the checkoff system; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-804, 2-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM