Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Acevero, Atterbeary, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Barron, Boyce, T. Branch, Bridges, Brooks, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Clippinger, Crutchfield, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gilchrist, Guyton, Harrison, Healey, Hill, Holmes, Ivey, M. Jackson, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Love, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Qi, Reznik, Rogers, Rosenberg, Ruth, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, C. Watson, Wells, Wilkins, Williams, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Climate Crisis Initiative in the Department of the Environment for certain purposes; requiring the Secretary of the Environment to administer certain schedules of greenhouse gas pollution fees; requiring the Secretary to delegate certain collection and benefit functions to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to carry out certain functions; requiring the collection of a certain greenhouse gas pollution fee on certain fuels for certain purposes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0912
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Text - First - Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1201,   2-1202,   2-1214 through 2-1228 )
Last Updated: 3/10/2020 2:34 PM