Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, Clippinger, Davis, Dumais, Frick, Waldstreicher, and Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum civil penalty that may be assessed against a person for a violation of the Maryland Antitrust Act from $100,000 to $10,000; and providing that each day a violation of the Act continues is a separate violation.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0891
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate West) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate West) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-43)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate West) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate West) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (93-43) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
(   11-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page