Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Attorney General, Office Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439 (SB0870)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Subpoena Power
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1480 /CH0592 (SB0982/CH0593)
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544 /CH0847 (SB0891/CH0848)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB1439)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Office of the Attorney General – Subpoena Power
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 /CH0848 (HB1544/CH0847)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 /CH0593 (HB1480/CH0592)
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1439 (SB0870) Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Subpoena Power By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1480 /CH0592 (SB0982/CH0593) Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1544 /CH0847 (SB0891/CH0848) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0870 (HB1439) Criminal Procedure – Office of the Attorney General – Subpoena Power By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 /CH0848 (HB1544/CH0847) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0982 /CH0593 (HB1480/CH0592) Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM