Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Healthy Air Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Jalisi
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Committee on Air Quality to create, on or before January 1, 2021, an air quality sampling and monitoring protocol for the collection of air quality and public health data associated with certain large animal-feeding operations; requiring that the protocol establish the methodology for the Department of the Environment to use to quantify and assess certain data; requiring the Department to report its findings from certain assessments and evaluations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 15, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0026 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Healthy Air Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Community Healthy Air Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:44 PM