Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/24/2020 5:34:10 PM
Thursday, September 24, 2020
Thursday, September 24, 2020
House
Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Change made: September 24, 2020 2:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
November 13, 2020 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: September 24, 2020 2:40 PM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Overview
October 22, 2020 9:30 AM
Virtual Meeting

Other
Financial Education and Capability Commission
Change made: September 24, 2020 1:44 PM - HEARING ADDED
Financial Education and Capability Commission - Other
October 7, 2020 10:00 AM to October 7, 2020 11:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
The Commission will discuss topics related to reentry into the workforce for people who were recently incarcerated.

Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Change made: September 24, 2020 1:02 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force - Other
September 24, 2020 1:00 PM to September 24, 2020 2:30 PM
On-Line Meeting
(Previous Location: Location-TBD)

Change made: September 24, 2020 1:13 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force - Other
October 8, 2020 1:00 PM to October 8, 2020 2:30 PM
On-Line Meeting
(Previous Location: Location-TBD)

Police Reform and Accountability in Maryland, Workgroup to Address
Change made: September 24, 2020 5:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Police Reform and Accountability in Maryland, Workgroup to Address - Other
October 1, 2020 1:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
This meeting is open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
Discussion of Recommendations.
A link will be made available to the public before the start of the meeting.
REMOVED: 5:20 PM

Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to
Change made: September 24, 2020 5:17 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to - Other
September 28, 2020 2:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
A link will be provided to the public before the hearing begins.
REMOVED: 5:17 PM