Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which a newborn is considered to be substance-exposed; and altering certain conditions under which a health care practitioner is not required to make a report concerning a substance-exposed newborn to a local department of social services.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {262318/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {262318/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text - Chapter - Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-704.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM