Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide to the Motor Vehicle Administration specified revised criminal history record information under specified circumstances; altering the application process for a criminal history records check for driving instructors; making a technical correction; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2016
Legislative Date
10/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2016 10/05/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 25
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM