Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland State Song - Revision
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Kelley, and Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Revising the state song by merging select verses from the poems "Maryland! My Maryland!", written by James Ryder Randall in 1861, and "Maryland, My Maryland", written by John T. White in 1894.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0215
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1241 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/10/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264339/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264339/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/10/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {264339/1 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {264339/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 47
House 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM