Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring insurers, except as otherwise provided in certain provisions of law, to maintain records of certain insurance transactions for at least 7 years after an individual or group policy of life insurance or an individual or group annuity is no longer in effect.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2018
Legislative Date
10/15/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 42
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-120 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM