Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Effect of Retirement Payments on Eligibility for Benefits - Revision
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances used to determine the effect of a retirement payment on the eligibility of an individual for unemployment insurance benefits; and altering the definition of "retirement payment".
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 18
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 19
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 21
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM