Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0478
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0336
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Effect of Retirement Payments on Eligibility for Benefits - Revision
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0337
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Calculation and Application of Table of Rates - Revision
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0339
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Actively Seeking Work Requirement - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0340
Title
Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0341
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0342
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0343
Title
Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0345
Title
Maryland Workforce Corporation and Health Care Personnel Training Fund - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0344
Title
Workforce Development - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0346
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Adult Education and Literacy Services - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0347
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Authority of the Secretary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100
Title
Farm Labor Contracting - State License Requirement - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0349
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the Secretary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0370
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Subcontractor Licensing Requirement - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0188 /CH0478 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 /CH0336 Unemployment Insurance - Effect of Retirement Payments on Eligibility for Benefits - Revision By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 /CH0337 Unemployment Insurance - Calculation and Application of Table of Rates - Revision By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0339 Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Actively Seeking Work Requirement - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0340 Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0341 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0342 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 /CH0343 Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0093 /CH0345 Maryland Workforce Corporation and Health Care Personnel Training Fund - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0344 Workforce Development - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0095 /CH0346 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Adult Education and Literacy Services - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0096 /CH0347 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Authority of the Secretary By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0100 Farm Labor Contracting - State License Requirement - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0349 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the Secretary By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 /CH0370 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Subcontractor Licensing Requirement - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM