Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making certain provisions of law authorizing the prelitigation discovery of certain insurance coverage information relating to claims involving vehicle accidents applicable to claims involving any tort involving death or bodily injury; providing that an insurer is required to provide a claimant with documentation of the applicable limits of coverage only in a certain automobile insurance policy, homeowner's insurance policy, or renter's insurance policy; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0144 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-43)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 24
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-2) 26
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 28
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (94-43) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Text - Chapter - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1101 through 10-1104, 10-1105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM