Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 9/28/2020 11:38:48 AM
Monday, September 28, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to
Created: 8/28/2020 1:32 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Please see the Commission webpage for the agenda. To view the meeting click here
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
(Added - 8/31/2020 8:44 AM)
A link will be provided to the public before the hearing begins.
(Removed - 9/24/2020 5:17 PM)